Armitage, Beverley Anne (CPSO#: 53869)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: P O Box 74010, 5 Beechwood Avenue, Ottawa, ON K1M 2H9
Date Received: 27 May 2015


Address: Dr. Armitage’s medical record requests can be obtained by writing to: Dr. B. Armitage PO Box 74010 5 Beechwood Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1M 2H9
Date Received: 26 Jun 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015