Armitage, Donald Pears (CPSO#: 20935)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Mar 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Iron Mountain Storage Company Tel: 1-800-327-8345
Date Received: 04 Jun 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Mar 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 2008

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Dec 1986
Summary:

 In December 1986, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Armitage guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Armitage's 
 licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months, but that this suspension would 
 itself be suspended indefinitely upon his filing proof with the Registrar of the College that he 
 had completed a continuing medical education program in the area of acid-base disorders, such a 
 course to be satisfactory to the Registrar.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Dec 1986