Armitage, Marshal Spencer (CPSO#: 91872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Boston University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
110 Liberty Street
Brockton MA  02302
United States
Phone: (508) 894-0400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Colorado
USA - Massachusetts
USA - New Hampshire

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARSHAL SPENCER ARMITAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMITAGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2009