Armogan, Narendra (CPSO#: 66736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Phone: (905) 212-9482
Fax: (905) 212-1012
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Armogan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Armogan ( CPSO# 66736 )

Business Address:
1880 Sismet Road
Mississauga ON  L4W 1W9
Phone Number: (905) 212-9482

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Barbados

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NARENDRA ARMOGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMOGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Sep 1999
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998