Armour, Alexis Devon (CPSO#: 71441)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2009