Armour, Edouard Frederick Hamylton (CPSO#: 27766)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Feb 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Feb 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of West Indies, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Feb 2015