Armstrong, Andrew Ian Maughan (CPSO#: 24563)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 29 Jun 2010

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 1, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking and consent by Dr. Andrew Ian Maughan Armstrong to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.

Dr. Armstrong has resigned from the College and has agreed not to apply or reapply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.