Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Armstrong, David (CPSO#: 65353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Cambridge, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Division of Gastroenterology
HSC-3V29
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76404
Fax: (905) 521-4958
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 19 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 6 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993