Armstrong, Gordon Walter Duncan (CPSO#: 12477)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 27 Nov 1954 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1947
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997