Armstrong, Harvey Alexander (CPSO#: 22434)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management, Unit 13, 1 High Meadow Place, Toronto, ON, M9L 0A3, 1(888)-563-3732
Date Received: 24 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016