Armstrong, Janice Patricia (CPSO#: 33076)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS, 111 St. Regis Crescent South, North York, ON M3J 1Y6 (416)398-0638
Date Received: 22 Jul 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 5, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Janice Patricia Armstrong to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 5, 2016:

Dr. Armstrong has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.