Armstrong, Karen Lea (CPSO#: 68894)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1
681 Algonquin Boulevard East
Timmins ON  P4N 8S6
Phone: (705) 267-5600
Fax: (705) 268-7244
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen & Dr. Paul Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Armstrong ( CPSO# 68894 )
Dr. P. Armstrong ( CPSO# 68895 )

Business Address:
1 - 681 Algonquin Boulevard East
Timmins ON  P4N 8S6
Phone Number: (705) 267-5600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN LEA ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997