Armstrong, Kevin Paul James (CPSO#: 65625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6000 Ext. 64219
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

339 Windermere Rd, London, ON
London ON  N6A5A5
Canada
Phone: 519-646-6000 Ext. 64219
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin P. Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Armstrong ( CPSO# 65625 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 2V4
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 13 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN PAUL JAMES ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997