Armstrong, Kyle Richard (CPSO#: 95308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 May 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105 Shipley St
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone: (519) 482-3000
Fax: 5194827648
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

395 Carrie st
Strathroy ON  N7G 3E2
Canada
Phone: 519 245 1550 Ext. 5533
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Armstrong ( CPSO# 95308 )

Business Address:
105 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone Number: (519) 482-3000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 16 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYLE RICHARD ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2014