Armstrong, Paul Wayne (CPSO#: 21789)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 21 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 May 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Sep 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011