Armstrong, Peter Frederick (CPSO#: 25628)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Feb 2016