Armstrong, Robert Douglas (CPSO#: 50090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
672 Brant Street
Suite 206
Burlington ON  L7R 2H3
Phone: (905) 333-3311
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Armstrong ( CPSO# 50090 )

Business Address:
206 - 672 Brant Street
Burlington ON  L7R 2H3
Phone Number: (905) 333-3311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT DOUGLAS ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1984