Armstrong, Ross Frederick (CPSO#: 17602)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 23 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 20 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jan 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999