Armstrong, Taylor Clayton (CPSO#: 82889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The George Hull Centre for Children
and Families
3rd Floor
81 The East Mall
Toronto ON  M8Z 5W3
Phone: (416) 622-8833 Ext. 232
Fax: (416) 622-7068
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAYLOR CLAYTON ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 12 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 13 Nov 2009 to 13 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2010