Arndt, Talitha Anna Tamara (CPSO#: 64505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Davisville Family Practice
Suite 600
1881 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C4
Phone: (416) 932-3172
Fax: (416) 440-0238
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TALITHA ANNA TAMARA ARNDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNDT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Aug 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1993