Arnold, Andrew Michael (CPSO#: 42182)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Armed Forces Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Oct 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017