Arnold, Cynthia Elaine (CPSO#: 52741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Mar 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
120 Vidal Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5X5
Phone: 519-332-8822
Fax: 519-332-8208
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

171 Kendall Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 4G6
Canada
Phone: (519) 337-4627
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cynthia Arnold Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Arnold ( CPSO# 52741 )

Business Address:
120 Vidal Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5X5
Phone Number: (519) 332-8822

Business Address:
OHCOW
171 Kendall Street
Point Edward ON  N7V 4G6
Phone Number: (519) 337-4627

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA ELAINE ARNOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNOLD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1986