Arnold, George Mathew (CPSO#: 56716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
Suite 406
379 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472-4553
Fax: (905) 472-1877
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE MATHEW ARNOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNOLD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987