Arnold, Ian Machray Fraser (CPSO#: 22336)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015