Arnold, Maria Ann Renee (CPSO#: 52505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1062 Ghislain Street
Suite 206
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3B2
Phone: (613) 632-7061
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Renee Arnold et Andre Borduas Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Arnold ( CPSO# 52505 )
Dr. J. Borduas ( CPSO# 52362 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
1062 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3B2
Phone Number: (613) 632-7061

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Apr 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA ANN RENEE ARNOLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNOLD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983