Arnold, Roland Spencer (CPSO#: 22461)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Liverpool, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1999
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1999
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 18 Jan 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 27 Jan 1998
Summary:

                                      1 
 
In January 1998, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Arnold guilty of professional misconduct as defined in Ontario Regulation 
448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 
27(3); in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); and, that he made improper 
use of the authority to prescribe, dispense or sell a drug, including falsifying a record in respect of a prescription or the sale of a 
drug, contrary to s. 27(26).    In addition, the Committee found Dr. Arnold is incompetent, as defined in s. 61(4) of the Health 
Disciplines Act, 1990, as amended, in that he displayed in his professional care of a patient a lack of knowledge, skill or 
judgment or disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates he is unfit to continue in 
practice. 
 
Subsequently, on January 18, 1999, the Committee ordered the following penalty: 
 
1.    The certificate of registration of Dr. Roland S. Arnold ( Dr. Arnold ) shall be suspended for a 
      minimum period of 12 months.    The suspension shall commence within 30 (thirty) days of 
      today s date, on a date to be fixed by the Registrar. 
 
2.    The  suspension  of  Dr.  Arnold s  certificate  of  registration  shall  continue  following  the 
      completion of the mandatory suspension provided in paragraph (1) above, until Dr. Arnold 
      completes the following steps: 
 
      (a)   he shall be referred to the McMaster Physician Review Program ( PREP ), and shall: 
 
            (I)   co-operate in every way with the assessment and any reassessment provided 
                  by PREP; and 
 
            (ii)  complete any training and upgrading which may be recommended by PREP, 
                  or as directed by the Professional Enhancement Department of the    College 
                  ( PED ) as a result of the PREP report, successfully and to the satisfaction of 
                  the Registrar, and submit himself to such further assessment or re-assessment 
                  as may be recommended by PREP or directed by PED, and shall complete any 
                  training  and  upgrading  recommended  by  PREP  or  directed  by  PED  on  the 
                  occasion  of  any  assessment  or  re-assessment,  sufficient  to  achieve  PREP 
                  Level 2, at a minimum; and 
 
            (iii) pay  all  costs  and  expenses  associated  with  his  assessment  and  any 
                  re-assessments at PREP and any remediation, which may be recommended by 
                  PREP or directed by PED, including costs for any practice supervision that 
                  may be required; and 
 
      (b)   he shall, at his own expense, and to the satisfaction of the Registrar, complete: 
 
            (i)   the College s Medical Record Keeping Course for Physicians; and 
 
            (ii)  the College s Prescribing Skills Course; and 
       
                                      2 
 
            (iii) a medical ethics course, with an ethicist selected by the Registrar; and 
 
      (c)   he shall, at his own expense: 
 
            (i)   become a member of the College of Family Physicians of Canada ( CFPC); 
                        and    
 
            (ii)  meet the annual requirements of the CFPC for continuing medical education 
                  ( CME ); and 
 
            (iii) within  thirteen  (13)  months  following  his  enrollment  as  a  member  of  the 
                  CFPC,  provide  written  evidence  satisfactory  to  the  CFPC,  provide  written 
                  evidence satisfactory to the Registrar that he has met the CME requirements of 
                  the CFPC. 
 
      (d)   he shall provide proof to the satisfaction of the Registrar that he has requested the 
            Minister of Health (Canada) to notify licensed dealers, and pharmacists by circular not 
            to provide or make any order for any narcotic on the order of Dr. Roland Spencer 
            Arnold. 
 
3.    Dr. Arnold s certificate of registration shall be subject to the following restrictions: 
 
      (a)   he shall not be permitted to prescribe narcotics; and 
 
      (b)   he shall restrict his practice so that he will see no more than 40 (forty) patients in any 
            single working day.    He shall submit monthly written reports to the satisfaction of 
            the Registrar concerning the number of patients seen by him on each working day of 
            the  prior month.    In the  event of non-compliance with the  limitation  of  40  (forty) 
            patients  per  day,  such  monthly  report  shall  include  an  explanation  of  the 
            circumstances  and  reasons  for  non-compliance.    In  the  event  Dr.  Arnold  fails  to 
            submit to the Registrar a monthly report by the end of the subsequent calendar month, 
            the Registrar shall immediately suspend Dr. Arnold s certificate of registration until 
            the required monthly report is received; and 
 
      (c)   he shall consent to, and co-operate in, unannounced inspections of his practice which 
            shall be conducted at least twice yearly and which may include a review of day books, 
            charts of patients seen and OHIP billings, at his own expense, for a period of three (3) 
            years following his return to practice; and 
 
      (d)   he shall: 
 
            (i)   maintain membership in the CFPC; and 
 
                                      3 
 
            (ii)  meet the annual CME requirements of the CFPC; and 
 
            (iii) annually provide written evidence satisfactory to the Registrar that he has met 
                  the annual CME requirements of the CFPC. 
4.    Dr. Arnold shall appear before the Discipline Committee to be reprimanded.    The fact of the 
      reprimand shall be recorded on the Register. 
 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 02 Feb 1999
Hearing Date(s): Oct 24, 1994