Arnold, Sandra Ruth (CPSO#: 65370)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Apr 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 09 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Apr 2002