Arntfield, Shannon Leigh (CPSO#: 82270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: Dunlop, Shannon Leigh (used until: 14 Feb 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC
800 Commissioners Rd
B2-430
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8289
Fax: (519) 685-8753
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shannon L. Arntfield Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arntfield ( CPSO# 82270 )

Business Address:
LHSC
800 Commissioners Road East
B2-430
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 646-6098

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANNON LEIGH ARNTFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARNTFIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2005 to 04 May 2005
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010