Aronoff, Michael Edward (CPSO#: 64779)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Feb 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 1999