Arora, Danny (CPSO#: 91130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 108
130 Adelaide Street West
Toronto ON  M5H 2K4
Phone: (416) 479-8554
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANNY ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2010 to 29 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2011 to 29 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jul 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2014