Arora, Rajeev Kumar (CPSO#: 69968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite #204
490 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6T0G1
Phone: (905) 792-6500
Fax: (905) 792-6853
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

490 Bramalea Road
Suite 204
Brampton ON  L6T 0G1
Canada
Phone: (905) 792-6500
Fax: (905) 792-6853
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 21 2013


Corporation Name: Dr. R. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Arora ( CPSO# 69968 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
490 Bramalea Road
Brampton ON  L6T 0G1
Phone Number: (905) 792-6500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJEEV KUMAR ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1998