Arora, Ritika (CPSO#: 110766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 21 Nov 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Maharashtra University of Health Scien, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Obstetrics
and Gynaecology
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 596-4800 Ext. 2452
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RITIKA ARORA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ARORA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ARORA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ARORA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ARORA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ARORA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ARORA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2016 to 20 Nov 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 29 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018