Arora, Samantha Aditi (CPSO#: 96080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre (TBRHSC)
Dept of Critical Care
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMANTHA ADITI ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Apr 2017
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2015