Arora, Sarvsheel (CPSO#: 90515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 27 Dec 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Maharshi Dayanand University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2817 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N4
Phone: (613) 789-1000
Fax: (844) 666-2491
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

934 Notre Dame Street
Embrun ON  K0A1W0
Canada
Phone: 613-443-0444
Fax: (844) 666-2491
County: County of Prescott and Russell
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arora ( CPSO# 90515 )
Dr. M. Arora ( CPSO# 93002 )

Business Address:
Riverview Medical Centre
2817 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 8N4
Phone Number: (613) 789-1000

Business Address:
Notre Dame Medical Centre
934 Notre Dame Street
Box 347
Russell ON  K0A 1W0
Phone Number: (613) 443-0444

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 27 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 27 Dec 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from December 27, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Sarvsheel Arora, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Arora to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. SARVSHEEL ARORA
                                          ("Dr. Arora")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Arora, certificate of registration number 90515, am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215013 (the "Investigation") into whether I failed
                  to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or am
                  incompetent in my family medicine practice, including the prescribing of
                  narcotics and controlled drugs.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Arora, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking
                  effective upon the date I sign it (the "Effective Date").

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Arora, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all elements of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Schedule "A",
                        including but not limited to, the following elements of
                        professional education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Within four (4) months of the Effective Date, review and
                              prepare a summary (2-4 pages each) of the following
                              resources:
                              1.    College Policy "Prescribing Drugs":
                                    
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Prescribing-Drugs;
                              2.    2017 Canadian Guideline for Opioids for Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain:
                                    http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/guidelines.html; 
                              3.    Centre for Effective Practice Management of Chronic
                                    Non-Cancer Pain Tool: https://thewellhealth.ca/cncp;
                                    and
                              4.    College Policy "Medical Records":  
                                    
                                    http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Medical-Records.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that the College will determine, in its
                        sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed each element
                        of the Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Arora, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        completing all elements of the IEP, I will submit to a reassessment
                        of my practice by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the "Reassessment").

                  (b)   I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment may
                        include a chart review, direct observation of my care, an interview
                        of me, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Arora, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment
                        conducted under the terms of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported to the College and that the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Arora, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within ten
                        (10) business days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I
                        further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within ten (10) business days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Arora, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Arora, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "B" and Schedule "C",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Arora, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        The College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Arora
                        failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession
                        and/or was incompetent in his family practice, including
                        prescribing of narcotics and controlled drugs.  As a result of the
                        investigation, Dr. Arora has agreed to the following:
                  
                        *     Dr. Arora will engage in professional education in the
                              prescribing of narcotics and controlled drugs.
                  
                        *     Following the professional education, Dr. Arora's prescribing
                              of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be
                              re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Arora, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I, Dr. Arora, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Arora, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff
                  and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or 
                  
                  (d)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which he or she reasonably believes
                        indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: December 27, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Sarvsheel Arora to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 27, 2017:

The College conducted an investigation into whether Dr. Arora failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and/or was incompetent in his family practice, including prescribing of narcotics and controlled drugs. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Arora has agreed to the following:

-Dr. Arora will engage in professional education in the prescribing of narcotics and controlled drugs.

-Following the professional education, Dr. Arora’s prescribing of controlled substances, including narcotics, will be re-assessed by an assessor selected by the College.