Arora, Shefali Dhindsa (CPSO#: 87714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Jul 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone: (519) 623-4200
Fax: (519) 623-2546
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017


Corporation Name: S. and H. Arora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Arora ( CPSO# 85872 )
Dr. S. Arora ( CPSO# 87714 )

Business Address:
Grandview Medical Centre
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 623-4200

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 12 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Shefali  Dhindsa  Arora  may  practise  medicine  independently  in Family
            Medicine, only.