Arora, Steven Kumar (CPSO#: 73449)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 May 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
Room 3A53
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75635
Fax: (905) 308-7548
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Arora Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arora ( CPSO# 73449 )

Business Address:
Department of Paediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Suite 3A53
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN KUMAR ARORA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARORA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2005