Arra, Ian (CPSO#: 101778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 2017

Expiry Date:  07 Sep 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 08 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Tichreen, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Unit
101 17th St E
Owen Sound ON  N4K 0A5
Phone: 519-376-9420 Ext. 1404
Fax: 519-376-0605
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 08 Sep 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 29 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 21 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 28 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 03 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 24 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 25 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Sep 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 08 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Ian Arra may practise public health and preventative medicine at Grey
                  Bruce  Health  Unit  in  Owen  Sound,  Ontario,  while  under supervision
                  coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires three  years  from
                  the date  of  issuance  or  when Dr. Arra's eligibility to take the Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of  any  concerns regarding Dr.
                        Arra's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the
                        required reports to the College by the due date  or  if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Arra's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate is issued on September 8, 2017, and will expire  on  or
                  before September 7, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.