Arrieta, Maria-Jesus (CPSO#: 60121)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 11 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Aug 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 09 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2006