Arrizza, Nicodemo (CPSO#: 53008)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002