Arrowsmith, Sarah Catharine (CPSO#: 84549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
574 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1C9
Phone: (613) 767-6056
Fax: (613) 767-3439
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.C. Arrowsmith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arrowsmith ( CPSO# 84549 )

Business Address:
103 - 574 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1C9
Phone Number: (613) 767-6056

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH CATHARINE ARROWSMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARROWSMITH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008