Arthur, Brian William (CPSO#: 50239)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian W. Arthur, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: 1290 Channelview Road, Kingston, ON K7L 4V1
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018