Arthur, Frederick Edward (CPSO#: 59421)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1989


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
975 Willow Drive
London ON  N6E 1P4
Phone: (519) 681-4982
Fax: (519) 681-6634
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 1B5
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arthur Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2006

Dr. F. Arthur ( CPSO# 59421 )

Business Address:
975 Willow Drive
London ON  N6E 1P4
Phone Number: (519) 681-4982

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. FREDERICK EDWARD ARTHUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARTHUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989