Artinian, Ara (CPSO#: 27414)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 15 Oct 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Oct 1993

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 15 Oct 1993

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Sep 1992
Summary:

 In September 1992, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Artinian guilty of professional misconduct, 
 as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he falsified a record in respect of 
 the examination or treatment of a patient, contrary to s. 27(16); in that he knowingly submitted a 
 false or misleading account or false or misleading charges for services rendered to a patient, 
 contrary to s. 27(17); in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, 
 contrary to s. 27(21); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  Consequently, the Committee 
 ordered that Dr. Artinian's licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 14 Oct 1993
Hearing Date(s): 29 Apr 1991


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Apr 1988
Summary:

 In April 1988, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Artinian guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that 
 are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 27(3); and in that he engaged in 
 conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
 circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Artinian be 
 reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.  The Committee further 
 ruled that the Doctor be fined the sum of $5000.00, and that his licence to practice be suspended 
 for a period of twenty-seven months.  It was stipulated, however, that the final twenty-four 
 months of this period of suspension would themselves be suspended, provided that Dr. Artinian, 
 before the end of his first three months of suspension, had submitted to the reprimand, had paid 
 the fine, and had cooperated in investigations of his practice of the kind provided for under s. 
 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, such inspections to take place commencing at 
 the end of the first nine months following the commencement of Dr. Artinian's twenty-seven month 
 suspension, and to occur thereafter at the end of each succeeding six months during the remainder 
 of the said suspension.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 26 Jun 1990
Hearing Date(s): 18 Apr 1988