Arts, Rudolfus Jacobus Hyacinthus Maria (CPSO#: 57284)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:Katholieke Universiteit, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: P O Box 20128 Barrie ON L4M 6E9
Date Received: 15 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016