Arul, Sara-Anne (CPSO#: 95576)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prince Edward Family Health Team
Suite 7, 389 Main St.
Picton, On
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613)476-5744
Fax: 613-476-8773
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sara-Anne Arul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Arul ( CPSO# 95576 )

Business Address:
Suite 7
389 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-5744

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARA-ANNE ARUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARUL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 28 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2014