Arvanitis, Jennifer Michelle (CPSO#: 66394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Names: Graham, Jennifer Michelle (used until: 21 Apr 2004 )     Henry, Jennifer Michelle (used until: 07 Feb 1994 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Temmy Latner Centre for
Pallative Care
60 Murray St., L4-000, Box 13
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 7884
Fax: (416) 586-4804
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER MICHELLE ARVANITIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARVANITIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1995