Arya, Brijesh (CPSO#: 54832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Madras, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20 Cityview Crescent
Stoney Creek ON  L8J 3V1
Phone: (905) 560-6996
Fax: (905) 578-9339
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIJESH ARYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARYA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1991