Arzt, Michael (CPSO#: 82188)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universitaet Regensburg, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2005 to 25 Apr 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Apr 2005 to 31 Jan 2006
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2006