Asaad, Nidal Ahmed (CPSO#: 70545)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kasturba Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005