Asaro, Rosalinda (CPSO#: 70153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#27-1077 North Service Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1A6
Phone: (905) 949-1700
Fax: (905) 949-8625
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber College Health Centre
205 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9W 5L7
Canada
Phone: (416) 675-6622
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosalinda Asaro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Asaro ( CPSO# 70153 )

Business Address:
27-1077 North Service Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1A6
Phone Number: (905) 949-1700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSALINDA ASARO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASARO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1998